U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00405
  • Case Name: Satterwhite v. Likkum, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 31, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 31, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting]
  • March 13, 2025: [Offer of Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.