U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00077
  • Case Name: Charles v. Lifeforce Digital, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Filing Discovery]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 28, 2025: [Compel Arbitration]
  • March 13, 2025: [Return of Service .....]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.