U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00724
  • Case Name: Q.H. v. Hunt Military Communities MGMT, LLC (MAG2)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Sealed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.