U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00296-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MITCHELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • March 13, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.