U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00064
  • Case Name: Carbajal v. Surge Entertainment Center Mobile, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Preliminary Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 19, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.