U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Issa v. City of Mobile et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 20, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer due deadline]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.