U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Ebury Street Capital, LLC v. Bankruptcy Administrator
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 01, 2025: [Status Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 23, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Deadline]
  • April 14, 2025: [Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response in Support]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.