U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Smiley v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Transfer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Transfer]
  • April 01, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 27, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.