U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • April 12, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 03, 2025: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • April 02, 2025: [Certification Regarding Preliminary Guideline Calculations of P.O.]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • March 18, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.