U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tecum-Xec
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Non-Appeal]
  • April 11, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.