U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Jackson v. Westlake Portfolio Management, LLC (MAG2)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 01, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 14, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.