U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00818
  • Case Name: Rosemond v. Veros Credit, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 01, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 18, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 09, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 08, 2025: [Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.