U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00472
  • Case Name: Adjessom v. Mobile et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer due deadline]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: [Preliminary Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.