U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00267
  • Case Name: Rudolph v. 1ProFence
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • April 03, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 01, 2025: [Motions Referred]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.