U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00484
  • Case Name: Bush v. Jackson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 01, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • May 01, 2025: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Filing Discovery]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 18, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.