U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Pilcher v. City of Foley, Alabama et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.