U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00163
  • Case Name: Bradham v. Washington (INMATE 2)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 18, 2025: [AO FORM 85]
  • April 18, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • April 10, 2025: [Return Receipt Card]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order to Answer Habeas]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Mail Returned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.