U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00701
  • Case Name: Kelly v. Alfa Mutual Insurance et al (MAG+)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 29, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 14, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 28, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 18, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.