U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00185-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Non-Appeal]
  • March 26, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Seal Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Return of Service .....]
  • March 18, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Subpoena]
  • March 17, 2025: [Subpoena]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.