U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Hendrix v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (CONSENT)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 24, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 24, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • April 11, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Withdraw]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.