U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00082
  • Case Name: Southall v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Reply Brief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 16, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • April 01, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 01, 2025: [Quash]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.