U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Disposition of Garnished Funds]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 22, 2025: [Disposition of Garnished Funds]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 09, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.