U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00159
  • Case Name: Chen v. Sakura Bistro Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.