U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00113
  • Case Name: Waitz et al v. Knotoulas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Preliminary Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 26, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: [Service Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 20, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.