U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00112
  • Case Name: General Insulation, Inc. v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 21, 2025: [Service Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 20, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.