U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Forte v. Wayne Farms LLC et al (MAG2)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Initial Disclosures]
  • April 18, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.