U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Greene
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • April 09, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.