U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00300-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ECHOLS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 07, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 01, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • March 25, 2025: [Variance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.