U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00214-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 16, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2025: [Detention]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 24, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.