U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gilchrist
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Release from Custody]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 31, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.