U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Snipes v. Waffle House, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • April 02, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Protective Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Preliminary Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.