U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00224-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aguilar-Vasquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure - 5K2 or 5K3.1]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Downward Departure - 5K2 or 5K3.1]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Expedite Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Consent Plea Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 17, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • April 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • April 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 17, 2025: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • April 01, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.