U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00223-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cruz Del Rio
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure - 5K2 or 5K3.1]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 21, 2025: [Downward Departure - 5K2 or 5K3.1]
  • April 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2025: [Consent Plea Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 10, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • April 10, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • April 10, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 07, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • April 01, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.