U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carlock
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Transcript Information Form]
  • April 22, 2025: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • April 21, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 21, 2025: [Appeal Instructions]
  • April 21, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.