U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • April 25, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Suppress]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 06, 2025: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.