U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00357
  • Case Name: Ardis v. Harmony Hospitality, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 25, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 17, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.