U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00135
  • Case Name: Davis v. The City of Selma, Alabama et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 15, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 15, 2025: [Case Transferred]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.