U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00137
  • Case Name: Turner v. Butler
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Return of Service Executed [Habeas]]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order to Serve Order and 2254 Petition]
  • April 11, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.