U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00225-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reyes-Ambrosio (Interpreter)
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • April 22, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Consent Plea Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 22, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • April 22, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • April 22, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 17, 2025: [Variance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • April 08, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.