U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00281
  • Case Name: Intake Breathing Technology, LLC v. Airway ESTD 2024
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 15, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 14, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 14, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.