U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00683
  • Case Name: Moseley v. Big's Trucking et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 07, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 07, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • May 06, 2025: [Consolidate Cases]
  • May 06, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • May 06, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 28, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 28, 2025: [Application to Clerk for Entry of Default]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 28, 2025: [Request for Entry of Default and Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 23, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.