U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00164
  • Case Name: Jubilee Landscape Management, Inc. v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 18, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Filing Proposed Summons]
  • April 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.