U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11124
  • Case Name: Javan Tsion Dukes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Submission of Payment Advices for Trustee]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice to Correct - Virtual Entry]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Order for Wage Deduction]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (Auto Assignment)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (USPCI ADI)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Debtor Atty Fees (Chp 13 ONLY and ONLY for INITIAL FEES)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Debtor Atty Fees (Chp 13 ONLY and ONLY for INITIAL FEES)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Official Form 121)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Submission of Tax Documents for Trustee]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Official Form 121)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Submission of Tax Documents for Trustee]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Request for Wage Deduction Order]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Submission of Payment Advices for Trustee]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Request for Wage Deduction Order]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Submission of Payment Advices for Trustee]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Debtor]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Debtor]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.