U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-60002
  • Case Name: CIE Preference Common Issues
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Miscellaneous Case]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 04, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Setting Hearing (SA)]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Support Documentation]
  • May 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic) (SA)]
  • May 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of No Objection]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Partial Summary Judgment (CM52)]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Change of Address]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Support Documentation]
  • November 30, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Discovery report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 29, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 21, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • September 21, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
  • September 19, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • September 19, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
  • September 19, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 18, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
  • September 18, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • September 13, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic) (SA)]
  • September 10, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 08, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic) (SA)]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
  • August 30, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • August 23, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • August 21, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 21, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • August 16, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • August 15, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • August 14, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • August 04, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Terminate Deadline]
  • August 03, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Partial Summary Judgment (CM52)]
  • August 03, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Support Documentation]
  • August 03, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Application / Motion]
  • August 02, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 01, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • July 31, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • July 28, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Joinder]
  • July 28, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • July 28, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • July 26, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • July 20, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Support Documentation]
  • July 20, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment (CM52)]
  • July 17, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • July 11, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings)]
  • July 11, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
  • July 10, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment (CM52)]
  • June 08, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Comply (SA)]
  • June 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Setting Hearing (SA)]
  • June 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Open a Miscellaneous Proceeding (Used In Open MP Case)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.