open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:1:18-cr-00016-1
    Party Name:USA v. Brink
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Declaration]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Expedite ]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Report]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Passport Surrendered]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Errata]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Review Hearing]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Unopposed Motion]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unopposed Motion]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Release]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:December 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:December 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Third Party Custodian Report]
    Date Published:December 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Report]
    Date Published:December 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change Venue]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Arrest - Other District]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?61100
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =