Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00003-1
    Party Name:USA v. Erisman
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Report]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Annotation re Wrong Event Selected]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Unopposed Motion]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unopposed Motion]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?61418
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =