open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of Alaska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00062-3
    Party Name:USA v. Ancheta et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order ]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit]
    Date Published:August 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Annotation re Non-Compliance with Fed. R. Cr. P. 49.1]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document ]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appear]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unopposed Motion]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Passport Surrendered]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody ]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Release]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Review Hearing]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Pretrial Services Report]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Third Party Custodian Report]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing ]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Vacate ]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Continue]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Docket Annotation - Indictment Filed]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - For Public]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:[1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Expedite ]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Declaration]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Expedite ]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Withdraw as Attorney ]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Pretrial Services Report]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Arrest]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?62083
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =