open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:3:18-cv-00259
    Party Name:Stovall v. ASRC Energy Services-Houston Contracting Company, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Case Status Report Order]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Text Notice of Deficiency (Answer)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?60949
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =