open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00163
    Party Name:Francisco v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov]
    Date Published:July 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation re Opening Brief]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Unissued Summons]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?62093
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =