open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00038
    Party Name:Eyre v. The City of Fairbanks et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Witness List]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joinder to Motion]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Case Status Report Order]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Unissued Summons]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?63080
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =